CA SB459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 226.8 and 2753 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB459 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 459 Corbett Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 459 Corbett Senate Third Reading By GATTO Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB459 Corbett (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Assembly - SB 459 Corbett Senate Third Reading By GATTO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 459 Corbett Senate Third Reading By GATTO Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB459 Corbett (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2412.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-07 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2988.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2824.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1117.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 765.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-07 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1174.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1174.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 226.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 2753 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 226.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 2753 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 9620 | New Code | See Bill Text |