CA SB458 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67825 of the Government Code, relating to military base reuse.
Title
Military base reuse authority: board of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB458 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 569.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 480.) (March 11). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 11. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 67825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |