CA SB458 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 14515.8 and 14571.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage container recycling: pilot projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB458 Wiener Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 458 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By FRIEDMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB458 Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2927.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3270.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2021.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1942.) (July 10).
2017-07-03SenateSet for hearing July 10.
2017-06-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1663.) (June 21).
2017-06-08SenateSet for hearing June 21.
2017-03-29SenateMarch 29 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code14515.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14571.45New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14571.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback