CA SB458 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 12207 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Insurance taxation: credit: College Access Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12207 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_458&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_458_bill_20150225_introduced.html |