CA SB456 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25160, 25218.1, 25218.5, and 25404 of, and to add and repeal Section 25160.8 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Household hazardous waste: transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB456 Huff (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 456 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB456 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 456 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB456 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 542.) (April 4). | |
2011-03-22 | Set for hearing April 4. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25160.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25218.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |