CA SB455 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Division 10.5 (commencing with Section 24000) of the Financial Code, relating to the Financial Empowerment Fund, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Financial Empowerment Fund: unbanked and underbanked populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB455 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 455 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB455 Bradford et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 455 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB455 Bradford et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 478, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2868.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 24000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |