CA SB455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 48204.3 of the Education Code, relating to pupil enrollment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil enrollment: military dependents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 455 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB455 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and V.A.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 29).
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code48204.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback