CA SB452 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31910 of, and to add Sections 27531, 27532, 27533, 27534, 27534.1, and 27534.2 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB452 Blakespear et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 452 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB452 Blakespear et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 452 Blakespear Senate Third Reading By Maienschein (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB452 Blakespear et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2843.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1280.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1171.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 803.) (April 18). |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 27531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27532 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27533 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27534 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27534.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27534.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 31910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |