CA SB452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14536, 14549.2, 14571.6, 14571.8, 14581, and 14585 of, and to add and repeal Sections 14572.3 and 14575.2 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to beverage containers, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB452 Glazer et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 452 Glazer Third Reading Urgency By GLORIA (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 452 Glazer Third Reading Urgency By GLORIA Amendment Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB452 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 6131.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6068.)
2018-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6772.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 6546.)
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 827.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback