CA SB450 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5852.1 to the Government Code, relating to bonds.
Title
Public bodies: bonds: public notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB450 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 450 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB450 Hertzberg et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 450 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB450 Hertzberg et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Published May 17 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 5852.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |