CA SB450 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3017 and 15320 of, to add Sections 4005, 4006, and 4007 to, and to add and repeal Section 4008 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: vote by mail voting and mail ballot elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB450 Allen Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 450 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 47 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 450 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB450 Allen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 450 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ (Y: 47 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 450 Allen Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ Amendment Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB450 Allen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 832, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5475.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 5437.) |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 25. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 6118.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5867.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | July 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 994.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 15320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 4005.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 4006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 4007 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 4008 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |