CA SB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 827, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 89002 and 89003 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: mass mailing prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB45 Mendoza et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 45 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB45 Mendoza et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 827, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2852.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2017-07-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 743.) (April 18).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05Senate(Corrected December 6).
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code89002New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code89003New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback