CA SB45 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 19990.01) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to Internet gambling, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet gambling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-31 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-01-03 Read first time.
2010-12-09 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 8.
2010-12-08 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19990.01New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback