CA SB446 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 17.5 (commencing with Section 175000) to the Public Utilities Code, relating to airports.
Title
Ontario International Airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB446 Dutton (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 864.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-15 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 175000 | New Code | See Bill Text |