CA SB443 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11470.1, 11488.4, 11488.5, and 11495 of, and to add Section 11471.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to forfeiture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture: assets: controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB443 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Assembly - SB 443 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By HADLEY (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 443 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By HADLEY (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB443 Mitchell (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2016-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5359.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-19SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 5825.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-24AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-23AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
2015-09-11AssemblyReconsideration granted. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
2015-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 44. Page 2105.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Hadley.
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2015-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1153.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-04SenateMay 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 4.
2015-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 730.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2015-04-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-02-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_443&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150225_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150602_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150716_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150901_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20160601_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20160804_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20160826_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_bill_20160929_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150421_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150603_0330PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20150910_0418PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20160815_0241PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0401-0450/sb_443_vote_20160824_0455PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback