CA SB440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18793, 18794, 18795, 18796, 18861, 18862, 18863, and 18864 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: California Breast Cancer Research Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund and California Cancer Research Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB440 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 440 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB440 Hertzberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 440 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB440 Hertzberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 445.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18793 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18794 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18795 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18796 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18861 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18862 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18864 | Amended Code | Citation Text |