CA SB439 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1006, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 601 and 602 of, and to add Section 602.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jurisdiction of the juvenile court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB439 Mitchell et al. Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 439 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By KAMLAGER-DOVE (Y: 43 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB439 Mitchell et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1006, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 6125.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 6969.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-13AssemblyJune 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 599.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code601Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code602Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code602.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback