CA SB435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3111 and 3117 of, and to add Part 10 (commencing with Section 2670) to Division 7 of, the Family Code, and to amend Section 68555 of the Government Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law: evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-24-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6. Page 798.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2670 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 3111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |