CA SB435 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16142 and 16142.1 of, and to repeal and add Section 16142.5 of, the Government Code, relating to agricultural land, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Williamson Act: payments to local governments.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (April 26). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16142.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16142.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |