CA SB435 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11362.777 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical marijuana.
Title
Medical Marijuana: personal cultivation.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB435 Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB435 Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 78 suspended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1302.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1153.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 758.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11362.777 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 24300 | New Code | See Bill Text |