CA SB433 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2775.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Gas corporations: zero-carbon and low-carbon hydrogen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB433 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB433 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | September 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 906.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and GOV. & F. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2775.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 1095.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 19573 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |