CA SB430 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 11367) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to small business.
Title
Small businesses: reduction or waiver of civil penalties for violation of regulations or statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & E.D. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11367 | New Code | See Bill Text |