CA SB430 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7522.04 of, and to add Section 7522.06 to, the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement benefits: judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB430 Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 654.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7522.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7522.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |