CA SB43 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14087.51 of, and to add Section 14087.511 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
County health systems: County of San Mateo: dental care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Hill et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1176.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 102825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 102875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 121565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.511 | New Code | See Bill Text |