CA SB43 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 7.6 (commencing with Section 2831) of Part 2 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electricity: Green Tariff Shared Renewables Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 43 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB43 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 43 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS Amend By WILLIAMS Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB43 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 43 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS Amend By WILLIAMS Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 3177.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2951.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2013-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 750.) (April 30). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11. |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 25019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2826.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2830 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2831 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 365.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |