CA SB427 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53069.45 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Water theft: enhanced penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Assembly - SB 427 Eggman Senate Third Reading By COOPER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Eggman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB427 Eggman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2308.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |