CA SB424 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 633.02 to the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: communications.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 424 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB424 Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB424 Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1153.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 822.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 633 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 633.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |