CA SB42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8610 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public lands, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public lands: Martins Beach: property acquisition.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB42 Hill et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 42 Hill Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Hill et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 42 Hill Third Reading Urgency By MULLIN (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Hill et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-08 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-08 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2690.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 3049.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1345.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 363.) (March 14). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6213.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 8610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |