CA SB418 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2601 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: skilled and trained workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB418 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 418 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB418 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 418 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB418 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 393, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2464.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2285.) |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Set for hearing August 30. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2261.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2764.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | June 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 869.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 445.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |