CA SB414 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17053.81, 17053.82, 23623.1, and 23623.2 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: qualified employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 881.) Reconsideration granted. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |