CA SB413 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 640 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 99580 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public transit.
Title
Public transit: prohibited conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB413 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 413 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB413 Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 413 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB413 Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 765, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2949.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | June 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1115.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99580 | Amended Code | Citation Text |