CA SB410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18976 of the Government Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Civil service: veterans’ hiring preference: active duty members.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 410 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB410 Nguyen et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB410 Nguyen et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E., R., & S.S. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1137.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1080.) (May 15). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 18976 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18979 | Amended Code | Citation Text |