CA SB407 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1102.155 to, and to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 1101.1) to Chapter 2 of Title 4 of Part 4 of Division 2 of, the Civil Code, relating to water conservation.
Title
Property transfers: plumbing fixtures replacement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 407 Padilla Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB407 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB407 Padilla (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB407 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB407 Padilla (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 587, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-11 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2419.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-11 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 3340.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-22 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. | |
2009-06-18 | To Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1190.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 875.) | |
2009-05-07 | Set for hearing May 12. | |
2009-05-06 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-04-28 | Set for hearing May 5. | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 609.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |