CA SB405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - July 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5272.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to outdoor advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outdoor advertising displays: exemptions: City of Artesia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB405 Mendoza (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-05AssemblyJuly 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 1134.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 857.) (April 25).
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code5272Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5272.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback