CA SB405 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69616 to the Government Code, relating to judges.
Title
Judgeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-31 - Assembly - SB 405 Corbett Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB405 Corbett (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB405 Corbett (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-31 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1227.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1116.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 415.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-11 | Set for hearing March 22. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69616 | New Code | See Bill Text |