CA SB404 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.73 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SB4 04 De Le (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Assembly - SB 404 De Leon Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB404 De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Assembly - SB 404 De Leon Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB404 De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5028.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5824.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5736.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |