CA SB40 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44274.9 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
Air Quality Improvement Program: vehicle rebates.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44274.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |