CA SB4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14007.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 5)SB4 Lar a Con (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB4 Lara Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Lara (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2015-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2779.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-09-09AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (September 9).
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2015-09-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (July 14).
2015-07-07AssemblyJuly 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-04SenateMay 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 4.
2015-04-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2015-04-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 9).
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_4&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150428_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150601_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150707_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150716_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150901_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150910_amended_asm_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20150916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20151009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150602_1049AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150909_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150911_0812PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20150911_1009PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback