CA SB4 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2924f of the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
Mortgages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-15 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB4 Calderon (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB4 Calderon Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB4 Calderon (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - SB4 Calderon Senate Third Reading By ENG (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB4 Calderon (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2011-08-15 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1914.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-13 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-07-11 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-07-11 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2252.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-21 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 908.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected March 4.) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |