CA SB4 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Stricken from Senate file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Stricken from Senate file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5008.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources: state beaches and parks: smoking ban.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB4 Oropeza (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - SB4 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - SB4 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Oropeza (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - SB4 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - SB4 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Oropeza (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Stricken from Senate file. Veto sustained. | |
2010-05-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-05-03 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-04-19 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2:45 p.m. | |
2010-04-15 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3196.) To enrollment. | |
2010-03-22 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 4363.) To Senate. | |
2010-03-18 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 24. Page 4340.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Brownley. Reconsideration granted. By unanimous consent. (Page 4341.) | |
2010-03-11 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 4262.) To third reading. | |
2010-01-05 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2010-01-04 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-08-27 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-07-01 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |
2009-06-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-05-26 | To Coms. on G.O. and W.,P. & W. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 892.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 339.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-17 | Set for hearing March 24. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2008-12-02 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |