CA SB396 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12950 and 12950.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 14005 and 14012 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: gender identity, gender expression, and sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB396 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 396 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 396 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND Amend By THURMOND Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB396 Lara (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2997.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3026.)
2017-09-15SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-09-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3400.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 2849.)
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 23).
2017-07-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-07-03AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 2425.)
2017-06-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-20AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 886.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 782.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-04-06SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code92685New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12950Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12950.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12950.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14005Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14012Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback