CA SB394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3051 and 4801 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole: youth offender parole hearings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB394 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 394 Lara Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 44 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB394 Lara et al (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3000.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 30. Page 3484.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-31AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 19).
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1352.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1184.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3051Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4801Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback