CA SB39 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33301, 33302, 33320, and 33322 of the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.
Title
Sierra Nevada Conservancy: Sierra Nevada Region: subregions: climate resilience and equity.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - SB 39 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB39 Laird et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB39 Laird et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2426.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 546.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 33301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 33302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 33320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 33322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |