CA SB39 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11105.9 of the Penal Code, and to add Sections 321.5 and 321.6 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraudulent claims: inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB39 Grove et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26AssemblyAugust 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2021-07-07AssemblyJuly 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and INS.
2021-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 918.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 520.) (March 16).
2021-03-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-25SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-02-24SenateMarch 9 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S., L., P.E. & R., and JUD.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code321.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code321.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Unemployment Insurance Code11105.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback