CA SB39 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22963 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 39 Hill Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB39 Hill et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2955.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 958.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22963Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback