CA SB39 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5205.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicles: high-occupancy vehicle lanes.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB39 Pavley Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 928.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 731.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 5205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |