CA SB388 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34162 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Redevelopment: Emergency Refunding Bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-08-23 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-08-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2945 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |