CA SB387 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6001, 6060.2, 6086.1, 6086.15, 6090.6, 6140, 6145, 6168, 6200, 6232, and 6234 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 6026.5 and 6026.7 of, to add Sections 6026.11 and 6060.25 to, and to repeal and add Section 6140.16 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 6252, 6276.04, 11121, and 11121.1 of the Government Code, relating to the State Bar.
Title
State Bar: attorneys: annual membership fees: meetings: public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB387 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 387 Jackson Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB387 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 387 Jackson Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB387 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 537, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3094.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |