CA SB386 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5080.44 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State parks: proposed closures: public notice.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harman [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB386 Harman Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 386 Harman Third Reading Urgency By HUFFMAN (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB386 Harman Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 386 Harman Third Reading Urgency By HUFFMAN (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB386 Harman Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained. | |
2011-09-21 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2011-09-20 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2011-09-01 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2593.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 28). | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-05-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 980.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 740.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5003.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.42 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5080.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |