CA SB385 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 116431 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Primary drinking water standards: hexavalent chromium: compliance plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB385 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 385 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 385 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Hueso Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 272, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2142.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1120.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12). |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | May 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116431 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |